Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 06/18/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/18/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/18/2013
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 06/18/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 06/18/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 06/18/2013
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 06/18/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 06/18/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 06/18/2013
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 06/18/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 06/18/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/18/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 06/18/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/18/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 06/18/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 06/18/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 06/18/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 06/18/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 06/18/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/18/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 06/28/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 09/10/2014
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 09/10/2014
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 09/10/2014
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 09/10/2014
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 09/10/2014
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 09/10/2014
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/10/2014
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 09/10/2014
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 09/10/2014
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 09/10/2014
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 09/10/2014
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 09/10/2014
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/10/2014
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 09/10/2014
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 11/12/2014