Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4]* 04/18/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 04/18/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 04/18/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/22/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 07/22/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/18/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 09/18/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 09/18/2013
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 09/19/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/28/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 01/14/2014
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 01/14/2014
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 01/14/2014
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 01/14/2014
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 01/14/2014
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 01/17/2014
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 01/17/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 02/26/2014
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 06/18/2014
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 06/23/2014
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 06/23/2014