Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 05/14/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/04/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/27/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/06/2014
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/06/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 05/20/2014
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 07/31/2014