Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 04/26/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 05/17/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/04/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/04/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/04/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 06/11/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 06/11/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 06/11/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 06/18/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/20/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/25/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 06/25/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/10/2013
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 07/10/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 07/10/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 07/10/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/11/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 07/22/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/22/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/30/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 08/02/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 09/10/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/10/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/10/2013
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 09/11/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 09/11/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/11/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 09/11/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 09/11/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/11/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 09/12/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 09/12/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/12/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/17/2013
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 09/17/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/17/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/17/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/17/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/17/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 09/18/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 09/18/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 09/18/2013
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 09/18/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 09/18/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 09/19/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/19/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/25/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 09/25/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/25/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 09/26/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/26/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 09/26/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 09/30/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 10/07/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 10/07/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 10/10/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 10/10/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 10/15/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 10/16/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 10/22/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 10/28/2013
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 10/30/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 10/30/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 11/12/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 11/12/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 11/18/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 11/19/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 11/19/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 11/19/2013
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 12/02/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 12/02/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 12/02/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 12/05/2013
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 12/11/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 12/11/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 12/16/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 12/19/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 01/08/2014
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/13/2014
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 01/15/2014
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 01/16/2014
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 01/27/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 01/28/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 01/31/2014
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 01/31/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 02/10/2014
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 02/21/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/14/2014
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/24/2014
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/01/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/01/2014
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/28/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 04/28/2014
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 05/20/2014
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/29/2014
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/29/2014
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/05/2014
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/09/2014
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 06/10/2014
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/10/2014
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 06/17/2014
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 06/17/2014
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/25/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/23/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 07/23/2014
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 07/25/2014
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/28/2014
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 07/29/2014
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 07/31/2014
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 08/01/2014
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/15/2014
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 09/15/2014
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 09/15/2014
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/15/2014
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 09/16/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 09/16/2014
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 09/16/2014
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 09/16/2014
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 09/16/2014
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/18/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/18/2014
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 09/18/2014
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 09/18/2014
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 09/18/2014
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/18/2014
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 11/17/2014
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/17/2014
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/17/2014
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 11/17/2014
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 11/17/2014
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 11/17/2014
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 11/17/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 11/17/2014
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 11/17/2014
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 11/17/2014
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 12/11/2014