Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/06/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/06/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/08/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/08/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 06/13/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/25/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 08/02/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/18/2014