Refine your search

Showing 7 of 7 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
08/08/2014 Became Public Law No: 113-148.
08/08/2014 Signed by President.
08/04/2014 Presented to President.
08/01/2014 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S5330)
07/31/2014 Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Carper without amendment. Without written report.
06/17/2014 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays (2/3 required): 398 - 0 (Roll No. 314).(text: CR H5377)
04/23/2013 Introduced in House