There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Ranch A Consolidation and Management Improvement Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Ranch A Consolidation and Management Improvement Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Ranch A Consolidation and Management Improvement Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To convey certain property to the State of Wyoming to consolidate the historic Ranch A, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
01/27/2014Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H1257)
09/10/2013Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-198.
04/23/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
07/30/2014SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held.
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining
01/28/2014SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
01/27/2014-5:53pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1257)
01/27/2014-5:45pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1684.
01/27/2014-5:45pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1257-1258)
01/27/2014-5:45pmHouseMrs. Lummis moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
09/10/2013HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 145.
09/10/2013HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-198.
07/31/2013HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
07/31/2013HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
07/31/2013HouseSubcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation Discharged.
07/19/2013HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation
05/02/2013HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
04/23/2013HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
04/23/2013HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources04/23/2013 Referred to
07/31/2013 Markup by
09/10/2013 Reported by H. Rept. 113-198
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation05/02/2013 Referred to
07/19/2013 Hearings by
07/31/2013 Discharged from
Senate Energy and Natural Resources01/28/2014 Referred to
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining07/30/2014 Hearings by

No related bill information was received for H.R.1684.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.1684. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (01/27/2014)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the House reported version is repeated here.)

Ranch A Consolidation and Management Improvement Act - Directs the Secretary of Agriculture (USDA), acting through the Forest Service, to convey to Wyoming, upon state request, without consideration and by quitclaim deed, all interest of the United States in approximately 10 acres of National Forest System land located in the Black Hills National Forest in Crook County, Wyoming.

Repeals the requirement that Ranch A be used for: (1) fish and wildlife management and educational activities; and (2) maintenance and restoration of the museum-quality real and personal property there. Repeals as well the reversionary interest of the United States in the property if the state of Wyoming uses it for any other purpose or develops the property.