Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7]* 04/24/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 04/24/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 04/24/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5]* 04/24/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 04/25/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/25/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 05/06/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 05/06/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 05/06/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 05/06/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 05/06/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/06/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/06/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 05/06/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 05/07/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/07/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/09/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/09/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 05/14/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 05/14/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/14/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 05/14/2013
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 05/15/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/16/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/16/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/22/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/22/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/22/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 05/22/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 05/23/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/03/2013
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 06/11/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/14/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/18/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 06/20/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 06/25/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 06/27/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/27/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/27/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 06/27/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 06/28/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 06/28/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 07/08/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 07/08/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 07/08/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 07/08/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/09/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 07/09/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 07/10/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 07/11/2013
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/17/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/19/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 07/19/2013
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 07/22/2013
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 07/22/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 07/22/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/22/2013
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 07/30/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 07/30/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 08/01/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/10/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/10/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 09/20/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 09/25/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 10/10/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 10/12/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/29/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 10/29/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 11/13/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 11/13/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 11/21/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 12/05/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 12/12/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 12/19/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 01/09/2014
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 01/14/2014
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 01/27/2014
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 02/04/2014
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 02/04/2014
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 02/25/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 02/25/2014
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 02/25/2014
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 03/06/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 03/06/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 03/12/2014
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 03/24/2014
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/26/2014
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/09/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/09/2014