Refine your search

Refined by:

Massachusetts Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/06/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 07/11/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 10/29/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 12/05/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 02/25/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 03/06/2014