Refine your search

Refined by:

New York Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 05/06/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 05/14/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 05/22/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/27/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 07/08/2013
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 07/30/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/29/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 02/25/2014
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 03/06/2014
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 03/24/2014