Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 06/27/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/27/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 07/25/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 07/25/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 07/25/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 09/17/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 09/17/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/25/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/14/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 02/25/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 07/16/2014
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 12/10/2014