Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 05/07/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/15/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/20/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 05/21/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 06/11/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/11/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 06/13/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/13/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 06/25/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/08/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/08/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 07/08/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 07/08/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 07/10/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 07/10/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 07/11/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/11/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 07/16/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/17/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 07/18/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 07/26/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 10/24/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 11/12/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 11/14/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 02/04/2014
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 02/26/2014
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 04/01/2014
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 04/02/2014
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 04/07/2014
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 06/18/2014
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 07/09/2014
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/09/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 07/09/2014
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 07/09/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 07/09/2014
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 07/10/2014
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 07/10/2014
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 07/10/2014
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 07/15/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/15/2014
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 07/15/2014
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/15/2014
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 07/15/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 07/15/2014
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/15/2014
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 07/16/2014
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 07/16/2014
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 07/16/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 07/22/2014
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 07/22/2014
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 07/22/2014
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 07/22/2014
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 07/22/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 07/22/2014
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/30/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/30/2014
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 07/30/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/30/2014
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 08/04/2014
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 08/04/2014
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 08/04/2014
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 08/04/2014
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 08/04/2014
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 09/15/2014