Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 05/15/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/25/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 10/02/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 07/11/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 07/22/2014