Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/19/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/19/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 07/10/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 07/18/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 07/18/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 07/18/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/18/2013
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/23/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 09/11/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/11/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 09/11/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 09/11/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 10/03/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 10/03/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 11/12/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 11/12/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 12/12/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 03/14/2014
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/07/2014
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 04/28/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/28/2014
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 06/10/2014
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 06/17/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/14/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 07/22/2014
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 07/23/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 09/16/2014
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 12/10/2014

Show cosponsors who withdrew