Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 04/24/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 05/06/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/06/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/08/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 05/08/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 05/09/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 05/14/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/14/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 05/22/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 06/03/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 06/03/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 06/03/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/12/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 06/12/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 06/27/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 06/27/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 07/08/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 07/30/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 09/19/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/19/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 09/19/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 09/19/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 09/19/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/19/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 11/15/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 11/15/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/15/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 01/08/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 01/14/2014
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 04/03/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/10/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/29/2014
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/29/2014
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/29/2014
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 04/29/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 05/19/2014
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/20/2014
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/20/2014
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 06/17/2014
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/23/2014
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 07/23/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 09/10/2014
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/12/2014
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 11/12/2014
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 11/12/2014