Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/06/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 05/06/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/11/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 06/20/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 06/28/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 10/09/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 07/31/2014