Refine your search

Showing 7 of 7 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
12/16/2014 Became Public Law No: 113-208.
12/16/2014 Signed by President.
12/10/2014 Presented to President.
12/08/2014 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/08/2014 Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6395-6396)
06/17/2014 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H5374)
04/24/2013 Introduced in House