Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/15/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 05/15/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 07/31/2013
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 12/02/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/28/2014