Refine your search

Refined by:

Colorado Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 05/06/2013
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 05/15/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/17/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 06/19/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 06/20/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 11/12/2013