Refine your search

Refined by:

Michigan Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 05/06/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 05/15/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/22/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/11/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 06/25/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 04/29/2014