Refine your search

Refined by:

New York Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11]* 04/24/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 05/15/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 05/15/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 05/15/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/15/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/20/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 06/03/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 06/05/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 07/30/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 08/02/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 09/20/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 12/09/2013