Refine your search

Refined by:

Pennsylvania Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 05/15/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 05/15/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/20/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 05/23/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 06/13/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 12/12/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 01/15/2014