Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 04/24/2013
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 05/06/2013
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/06/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 05/15/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/15/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/15/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 05/15/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/15/2013
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 05/20/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/20/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/20/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 05/20/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 05/20/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 05/20/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/22/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 05/22/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/23/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 06/03/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 06/04/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/05/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/12/2013
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 06/13/2013
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 06/14/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/14/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/17/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/17/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/08/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/19/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 07/19/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/23/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 07/30/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/31/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 08/02/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/12/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 09/20/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 11/12/2013
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 11/19/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 11/19/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 12/09/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 12/09/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 12/12/2013
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 01/27/2014
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 02/03/2014
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 05/08/2014
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 05/20/2014
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 06/10/2014