Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 04/25/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17]* 04/25/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 04/25/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43]* 04/25/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/21/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/21/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 05/21/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/21/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 05/21/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 05/21/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/21/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 05/21/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/21/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 05/23/2013
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 05/23/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/23/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 05/23/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 05/23/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 05/23/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 06/20/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 06/20/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 06/20/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 08/01/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 08/01/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 08/01/2013
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 08/01/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 08/01/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/25/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 10/04/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 10/04/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/04/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 10/04/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 10/04/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 10/04/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 10/30/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 11/18/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 11/18/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 11/18/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 03/14/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/24/2014
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 03/24/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 04/03/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/09/2014
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/11/2014
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 07/29/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 07/30/2014
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 07/30/2014
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 11/12/2014