Refine your search

6 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
06/10/2014 Became Public Law No: 113-120. (TXT | PDF)
06/10/2014 Signed by President.
06/03/2014 Presented to President.
05/22/2014 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S3308)
05/19/2014 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H4440-4441)
04/25/2013 Introduced in House