Refine your search

Refined by:

Arizona Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 05/14/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 06/04/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 10/28/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 01/16/2014
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 02/06/2014
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 02/25/2014