Refine your search

Refined by:

Connecticut Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 07/18/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 07/22/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/24/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/10/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 10/08/2013