Refine your search

Refined by:

Georgia Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 05/15/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/16/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 12/02/2013
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 12/11/2013
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 12/16/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 01/16/2014
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 02/06/2014
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 02/28/2014