Refine your search

Refined by:

Michigan Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 05/16/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 09/09/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 09/26/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 10/28/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 01/15/2014
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 01/15/2014