Refine your search

Refined by:

Minnesota Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/20/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 06/27/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 10/28/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 01/16/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 02/03/2014