Refine your search

Refined by:

New Jersey Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 05/14/2013
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 05/15/2013
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/10/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 10/08/2013
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 11/15/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 12/02/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 12/02/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 12/05/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 12/12/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 01/10/2014
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 01/27/2014