Refine your search

Refined by:

North Carolina Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/14/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 01/10/2014
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 01/15/2014
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 01/16/2014
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 02/04/2014
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 02/10/2014
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 02/27/2014
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/05/2014