Refine your search

Refined by:

Ohio Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/18/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 10/28/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 12/02/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 12/02/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 12/10/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 12/12/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 12/12/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 01/15/2014
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 02/06/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 02/21/2014