Refine your search

Refined by:

Tennessee Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/15/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 11/18/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 02/06/2014
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 02/21/2014
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 02/27/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/27/2014