Refine your search

Refined by:

Virginia Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 08/01/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 11/12/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/02/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 01/10/2014
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/21/2014