Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 05/14/2013
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 05/14/2013
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 05/14/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/14/2013
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 05/15/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 05/15/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 05/15/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 05/15/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/15/2013
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 05/15/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 05/15/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 05/16/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 05/21/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/04/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 06/12/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 06/12/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 06/20/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 06/25/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 06/27/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 06/27/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 07/18/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 07/23/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 07/23/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 08/01/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 08/01/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 08/01/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 09/09/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 09/09/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 09/09/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 09/10/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/10/2013
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 09/26/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/26/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 10/02/2013
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 10/02/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 10/07/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 10/23/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 10/28/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 10/28/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 10/28/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 10/28/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 10/28/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 10/28/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 10/28/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 10/28/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 10/28/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 10/28/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 10/28/2013
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 10/28/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 10/29/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 11/12/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 11/12/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 11/12/2013
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 11/15/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 11/18/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 11/18/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 11/18/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 11/18/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 11/18/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 11/21/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 11/21/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 12/02/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 12/02/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 12/04/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 12/10/2013
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 12/11/2013
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 12/11/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 12/12/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 12/12/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 12/12/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 12/19/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 01/07/2014
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 01/10/2014
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 01/10/2014
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 01/10/2014
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 01/10/2014
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 01/15/2014
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 01/17/2014
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 01/27/2014
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 01/28/2014
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 02/04/2014
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 02/06/2014
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 02/06/2014
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 02/06/2014
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 02/06/2014
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 02/06/2014
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 02/06/2014
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 02/06/2014
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 02/06/2014
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 02/10/2014
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 02/21/2014
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 02/21/2014
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 02/21/2014
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 02/21/2014
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 02/21/2014
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 02/21/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 02/21/2014
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/21/2014
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 02/26/2014
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 02/27/2014
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/27/2014
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 02/27/2014
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 02/27/2014
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 02/27/2014
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 02/27/2014
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 02/27/2014
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 02/27/2014
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 02/28/2014
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 02/28/2014
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/28/2014
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 02/28/2014
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 02/28/2014
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 03/04/2014
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 03/06/2014
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 03/24/2014
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 04/10/2014
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 04/30/2014