Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 04/25/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 04/25/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5]* 04/25/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 04/26/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/26/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 05/20/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 05/20/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/20/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 05/23/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/17/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/24/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/09/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 09/09/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/08/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/09/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 11/20/2014