Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/06/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 07/08/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 02/28/2014
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/13/2014
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/28/2014
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 06/19/2014