Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 04/26/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 04/26/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/06/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/06/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/20/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 06/04/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 06/12/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 07/08/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/20/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 11/13/2014