There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

American Opportunity Tax Credit Act of 2013

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to extend and modify the American Opportunity Tax Credit, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/25/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
04/25/2013Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/25/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (115)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-34]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/25/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 04/25/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 04/25/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/16/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 05/16/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/16/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/16/2013
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 05/16/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 05/16/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 05/16/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 05/16/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 05/16/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 12/02/2013
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 12/02/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 12/02/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 02/26/2014
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 02/26/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 02/26/2014
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/26/2014
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/26/2014
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 02/26/2014
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 02/26/2014
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 02/28/2014
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 02/28/2014
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 02/28/2014
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 03/14/2014
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 03/14/2014
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/14/2014
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/14/2014
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 03/14/2014
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 03/14/2014
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 03/14/2014
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 03/14/2014
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 03/14/2014
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 03/14/2014
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 03/14/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 03/25/2014
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 03/25/2014
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/25/2014
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 04/30/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 04/30/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 04/30/2014
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 05/30/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/31/2014
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4] 07/31/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/18/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means04/25/2013 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1738. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/25/2013)

American Opportunity Tax Credit Act of 2013 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to replace the Hope Scholarship and Lifetime Learning tax credits with a new American Opportunity Tax Credit that: (1) allows an income tax credit of up to $2,500 of the qualified tuition and related expenses of a student who is carrying at least one half of a normal course load, (2) increases the income threshold for reductions in the credit amount based upon modified adjusted gross income, (3) allows a lifetime dollar limitation on such credit of $15,000 for all taxable years, and (4) makes 40% of the credit refundable. Allows an exclusion from gross income of any amount received as a Federal Pell Grant.