Refine your search

Refined by:

Illinois Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 04/26/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 06/26/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/27/2013
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 10/16/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 11/18/2013