Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 05/17/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 05/17/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 05/17/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 05/17/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 05/17/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 05/21/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/06/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 06/11/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 06/11/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 07/09/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/09/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 07/30/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 09/10/2013