Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 01/23/2013
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 02/13/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/15/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 02/15/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 02/15/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 02/25/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 02/25/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 02/28/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 02/28/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 02/28/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 02/28/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 02/28/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 02/28/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 02/28/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 02/28/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 02/28/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 02/28/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 02/28/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 02/28/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 02/28/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 02/28/2013
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 03/04/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 03/04/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 03/04/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 03/05/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 03/05/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 03/12/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 03/12/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 03/13/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 03/13/2013
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 03/13/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 03/13/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/15/2013
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 03/18/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 03/18/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/18/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 03/19/2013
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 04/10/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 04/10/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 04/12/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 04/12/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 04/23/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 04/25/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 04/25/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/26/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 05/07/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 05/08/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 05/14/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 05/23/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/24/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 06/13/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 06/25/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 06/26/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 06/26/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/28/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/09/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 07/11/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 07/11/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 07/16/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 07/17/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 07/23/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/24/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/09/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 09/16/2013
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 01/09/2014
Rep. McAllister, Vance M. [R-LA-5] 01/14/2014