Refine your search

Refined by:

Florida Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 05/09/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 12/16/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 03/24/2014
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 03/26/2014
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 04/01/2014
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 06/25/2014
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 11/12/2014
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 11/19/2014
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 12/12/2014