Refine your search

Refined by:

Illinois Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/07/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 08/02/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/18/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 10/22/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/13/2014
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 03/26/2014
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 05/08/2014