Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/03/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 05/07/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/07/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 05/09/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/09/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 05/09/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 05/09/2013
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/09/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 05/09/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/16/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/16/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/16/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/24/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 05/24/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/24/2013
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/24/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 05/24/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 06/11/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/11/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 06/18/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/19/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/19/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/19/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 06/26/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/09/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 07/11/2013
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/11/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 07/16/2013
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/19/2013
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 07/19/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/30/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 07/30/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/30/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 08/02/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 08/02/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 08/02/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/18/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 09/18/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/18/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 10/22/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 10/28/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 10/28/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 11/12/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 11/12/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 11/15/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 11/19/2013
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 12/03/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 12/16/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 01/07/2014
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 01/07/2014
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 01/07/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 01/07/2014
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 01/09/2014
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 01/09/2014
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 01/15/2014
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 01/16/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 01/16/2014
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 01/16/2014
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 01/27/2014
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12] 01/27/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 01/27/2014
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 01/31/2014
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 02/04/2014
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 02/11/2014
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 02/14/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 02/25/2014
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 02/25/2014
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 02/25/2014
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 03/13/2014
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/13/2014
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 03/13/2014
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 03/13/2014
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 03/24/2014
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 03/24/2014
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/24/2014
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 03/24/2014
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/24/2014
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 03/24/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/24/2014
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/24/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 03/25/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 03/26/2014
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 03/26/2014
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 03/26/2014
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 04/01/2014
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 04/01/2014
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 04/29/2014
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 04/29/2014
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/29/2014
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 05/08/2014
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/20/2014
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 05/20/2014
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 05/20/2014
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 05/21/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 05/28/2014
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 05/28/2014
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 05/28/2014
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 05/28/2014
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 06/10/2014
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 06/10/2014
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/10/2014
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/18/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 06/19/2014
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 06/25/2014
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 07/16/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 07/17/2014
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 07/17/2014
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 07/28/2014
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/29/2014
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/09/2014
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 09/09/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 09/09/2014
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 09/15/2014
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/17/2014
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 11/12/2014
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 11/12/2014
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 11/13/2014
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 11/13/2014
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 11/13/2014
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 11/19/2014
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 12/08/2014
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 12/12/2014
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 12/12/2014