Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10]* 04/25/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 04/25/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 04/25/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/06/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 05/06/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 05/06/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/06/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/06/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 05/06/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 05/06/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/06/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/06/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 05/08/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/08/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 05/08/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 05/08/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 05/08/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/08/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 05/08/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 05/08/2013
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 05/08/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/14/2013
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 05/14/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 05/14/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 05/14/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/14/2013
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/14/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 05/22/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/22/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 05/22/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/22/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 05/22/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 05/22/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 05/22/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 06/17/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 06/17/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 07/10/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 07/10/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/30/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 09/19/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 09/30/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 11/20/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/20/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 11/20/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 12/11/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 12/11/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 12/11/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/11/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 12/12/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 12/12/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 12/12/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 12/12/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 12/16/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 12/16/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 12/16/2013
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 12/19/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 12/26/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 01/13/2014
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 01/13/2014
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 01/13/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 01/13/2014
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 01/13/2014
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 01/13/2014
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 01/31/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/24/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 05/20/2014
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 05/20/2014
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 05/20/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 06/19/2014
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 07/24/2014