Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 05/20/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/08/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/10/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/10/2014