Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 04/26/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 05/09/2013
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/20/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 05/20/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/12/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/08/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/10/2013
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 07/18/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/17/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 03/24/2014
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 07/09/2014
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/10/2014