Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11]* 04/26/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 05/14/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5] 05/14/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/14/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 05/14/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/22/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/03/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/11/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 06/11/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 06/11/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/11/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 06/13/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/28/2013
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 06/28/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 07/09/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/17/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 07/17/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/17/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 07/18/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 07/19/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 07/19/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 07/19/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 07/22/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 07/22/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 07/22/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 07/23/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/24/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 07/24/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/26/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 07/26/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 07/30/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 07/30/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 08/02/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 08/02/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 08/02/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 09/09/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/09/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/09/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/12/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 10/11/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/23/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 11/13/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 12/02/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 01/07/2014
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 01/15/2014
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 02/04/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 02/04/2014
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 02/27/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 03/11/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/24/2014
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/05/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/17/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 06/17/2014
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 12/04/2014